Haddara, Wael Mahmoud (CPSO#: 73614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Critical Care Medicine
L H S C - University Campus Site
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5375
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 663-3531
Fax: (519) 663-8813
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wael M. R. Haddara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Haddara ( CPSO# 73614 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 4V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAEL MAHMOUD HADDARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003