Hadi, Mohammed (CPSO#: 84220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Dover Doctor's Office
North Shore Centre
697 Highway 6
PO Box 728
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone: (519) 583-0893
Fax: (519) 583-0010
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hadi ( CPSO# 84220 )

Business Address:
3 - 697 Highway 6
P O Box 728
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-0893

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2009