Hadian, Abbas (CPSO#: 50663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Haji-Hadian, Abbas (used until: 30 Oct 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Iranian

Education:University of Tehran, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 223-6929
Fax: (416) 223-6820
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1110 SHEPPARD AVE E # 310 M2K2W2
Toronto ON  M2K 1E6
Canada
Phone: 416 2236929
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hadian ( CPSO# 50663 )

Business Address:
310 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-6929

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 23, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Abbas Hadian in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hadian to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. ABBAS HADIAN
                                          ("Dr. Hadian")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hadian, certificate of registration number 50663, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge that the College initiated investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 100848 and 7216275 (the "Investigations") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  general medicine practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge that there has been no referral to the
                  Discipline Committee in respect of the Investigations and that, after the
                  College receives an original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no
                  further action will be taken on the Investigations.

            B.    UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

            (5)   I, Dr. Hadian, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   I, Dr. Hadian, hereby resign from the College effective August 1, 2018
                  (the "Resignation Date").

            (7)   I, Dr. Hadian, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration
                  as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction
                  after the Resignation Date.

            (8)   I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge that in the event that the College should
                  become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not
                  limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or
                  attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a
                  certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any
                  jurisdiction after the Resignation Date, the College shall, in its sole
                  discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on
                  the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to
                  proceed with the Investigations it terminated as a result of this
                  Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (9)   I, Dr. Hadian, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the
                  passage of time might cause to my ability to make full answer and
                  defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the basis of the
                  passage of time, should the College proceed with any allegations that may
                  arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking and/or pursuant to
                  section (8) above.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hadian, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            (11)  I, Dr. Hadian, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number
                  be deactivated for services rendered after the Resignation Date.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if
                  any, arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Hadian, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hadian, consent to this Undertaking being posted on the
                        Public Register.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hadian, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Hadian
                              failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
                              in his general medicine practice. During the investigations,
                              Dr. Hadian resigned from the College, effective August 1,
                              2018 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for
                              registration as a physician in Ontario or any other
                              jurisdiction. As a result, the College took no further action
                              on the investigations.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Abbas Hadian to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario efective April 23, 2018:

The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Hadian failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his general medicine practice. During the investigations, Dr. Hadian resigned from the College, effective August 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. As a result, the College took no further action on the investigations.