Hadid, Vicky Orit (CPSO#: 105084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Sacre Coeur de Montreal
5400 Boul Gouin Ouest
montreal QC  H4J1C5
Phone: 5143382222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICKY ORIT HADID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016