Hadjiliadis, Denis (CPSO#: 75993)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 835 W Gates Building 3400 Spruce Street Philadelphia, PA 19104 U.S.A
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2014