Hadjis, Nicholas Stamatios (CPSO#: 80495)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 08 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2013