Hadlock, Shane David (CPSO#: 81258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 688-2863
Fax: (613) 688-2864
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shane Hadlock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hadlock ( CPSO# 81258 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 688-2863

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANE DAVID HADLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010