Haebe, Jeffrey John (CPSO#: 71040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Green Valley Crescent
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378 Ext. 621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Haebe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haebe ( CPSO# 71040 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 686-3378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOHN HAEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Apr 1997 to 07 May 1997
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1998 to 11 Feb 1998
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 1999 to 13 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001