Hafez, Mahmoud Alm El-Din Abdel (CPSO#: 84100)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2006 to 22 May 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 May 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006