Hagag, Musadak Yafaw (CPSO#: 85657)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Zagreb, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2006 to 29 Oct 2006
PEAP - Resident - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2006 to 29 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2007 to 29 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2008 to 29 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011