Haghbin, Zhila (CPSO#: 72715)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 2006