Haghighat, Kasra Mike (CPSO#: 81275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
YORK MEDICAL CHRONIC PAIN CLINIC
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: (905) 830-0667
Fax: (905) 853-0200
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

YORK MEDICAL CLINIC
10660 Yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Canada
Phone: 905 237-9096
Fax: 905 883-0004
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Haghighat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haghighat ( CPSO# 81275 )

Business Address:
Units 2 & 3
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Business Address:
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASRA MIKE HAGHIGHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGHIGHAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006