Haghiri, Behnia (CPSO#: 89404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
Front Avenue Resources Centre
Suite 4
25 Front Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone: (613) 342-2522
Fax: (613) 345-4111
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

162 Division street
Kingston ON  K7L 3M6
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-0228
Fax: (613) 544-0224
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behnia Haghiri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Haghiri ( CPSO# 89404 )

Business Address:
162 Division Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3M6
Phone Number: (613) 544-0228

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
Front Avenue Resources Centre
Suite 4
25 Front Avenue West
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2522

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHNIA HAGHIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGHIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013