Hahn, Margaret Karolina (CPSO#: 91868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 4368
Fax: (416) 979-4292
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET KAROLINA HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009