Haidar, Ramin (CPSO#: 94361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Upper Level
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone: 905-540-4433
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramin Haidar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Haidar ( CPSO# 94361 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Business Address:
Upper Level
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 540-4433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMIN HAIDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012