Haider, Aamir (CPSO#: 71293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B9
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 842-8500
Fax: (905) 842-8502
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haider ( CPSO# 71293 )

Business Address:
B9 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 842-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2000 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 18 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AAMIR HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000