Haider, Ehsan Ahmed Hussain (CPSO#: 84853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Radiology
50 Charlton Ave. E., Rm. T0733
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 37326
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4197 Kane Cr
Burlington ON  L7M 5C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 320-9377
Fax: (905) 635-8211
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300


Corporation Name: Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Almohri ( CPSO# 84823 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Radiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room T0733
Hamilton ON  L7M 5B1

Business Address:
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bahrain

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EHSAN AHMED HUSSAIN HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2007