Haider, Faeza Haider Hasan Ali (CPSO#: 84513)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2006 to 05 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 06 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008