Haider, Kamil (CPSO#: 77418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Malton Urgent Care Clinic
3530 Derry Road East
Unit 110-111
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 672-2273
Fax: (905) 672-0487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Brampton Urgent Care Clinic
51 Mountainash Road, Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 799-2722
Fax: (905) 799-6727
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd, Unit 10
Toronto ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 907-5362
Fax: (416) 741-3542
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Woodbridge Urgent Care Clinic
4000 Highway 7, Unit 2
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 851-3777
Fax: (905) 851-0682
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mississauga Urgent Care Clinic
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: (905) 212-1433
Fax: (905) 212-1428
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haider ( CPSO# 77418 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 212-1433

Business Address:
Unit 8
51 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMIL HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 May 2002 to 02 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002