Haigh, Kim Diane (CPSO#: 72450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Emergency Department
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-2181 Ext. 4328
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kim D. Haigh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haigh ( CPSO# 72450 )

Business Address:
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-2181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM DIANE HAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2000