Haines, Mary Ann (CPSO#: 75117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Names: Kent Haines, Mary Ann (used until: 21 Feb 2011 )     Kent, Mary Ann (used until: 25 Nov 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 State Street
26th Floor
Boston MA  02109
United States
Phone: 646-265-9525

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANN HAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 14 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002