Hajas, Adriana Prodan (CPSO#: 84765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
James Snow Medical & Walk In Clinic
Unit C2
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton ON  L9E 0H1
Phone: (905) 636-1050
Fax: (905) 636-1090
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adriana Hajas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hajas ( CPSO# 84765 )

Business Address:
James Snow Medical & Walk In Clinic
Unit-C2
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton ON  L9T 0R3
Phone Number: (905) 636-1050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA PRODAN HAJAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 07 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009