Hajcsar, Ernest Eugene (CPSO#: 73896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B5
645 Plains Road
Burlington ON  L7T 4J5
Phone: (905) 681-3430
Fax: (905) 681-7525
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2025 Guelph Line
Unit 183
Burlington ON  L7P 4M8
Canada
Phone: (905) 681-7755
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERNEST EUGENE HAJCSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJCSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 02 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Aug 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2014
Summary:

On May 1, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ernest Eugene Hajcsar committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hajcsar admitted to 
the allegation.  
 
Dr. Hajcsar practises family medicine and offers cosmetic treatments in a clinic shared with his 
now ex-spouse. Dr. Hajcsar saw Patient A as a patient on numerous occasions including acting 
as her family physician when his ex-spouse, Patient A’s primary family physician, was on 
maternity leave. Between approximately 2004 and January 2012, Dr. Hajcsar treated Patient A 
for a variety of health issues, including providing supportive psychotherapy and beginning in 
August 2011, cosmetic treatments. 
 
Dr. Hajcsar inappropriately violated appropriate boundaries with Patient A on a number of 
occasions: 
• by commenting inappropriately on Patient A’s physical appearance 
• sometimes brushing back the front of Patient A’s hair when speaking to her 
• kissing Patient A briefly while assisting her in putting on her coat when she was leaving the 
  clinic on two or three occasions 
• touching Patient A’s shoulder as she was leaving, in what she perceived as an affectionate 
  manner 
• hugging Patient A from time to time or putting an arm around her shoulder, either in greeting 
  or by way of reassurance, for example when she was going to receive an influenza 
  vaccination 
• Patient A felt this behavior was confusing and odd 
 
In 2012, at the conclusion of a follow-up assessment of a cosmetic treatment, Dr. Hajcsar joked 
to Patient A, offering to “test” her “new lips.”  He then kissed her on the lips.  It was not a long 
kiss, but Patient A described it as a “big kiss.” Dr. Hajcsar then walked into the waiting area with 
Patient A and, in the presence of Patient A and the receptionist, joked that he “gave [Patient A]’s 
lips a test drive.”  Patient A heard laughter in the waiting room and was uncomfortable. This 
conduct violated the appropriate boundary between a physician and a patient. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
• the Registrar suspend Dr. Hajcsar’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months 
  commencing at 12:01 am on June 1, 2014 
• Dr. Hajcsar appear before the panel to be reprimanded 
• Dr. Hajcsar pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the 
  date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2014