Hajek, Vlasta Eva (CPSO#: 31101)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Masaryk University of Brno, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 32 De Vere Gardens Toronto ON M5M 3E7
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018