Haji, Rahim Bashir (CPSO#: 113761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 19 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4164599189
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHIM BASHIR HAJI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HAJI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HAJI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAJI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HAJI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HAJI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HAJI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 21 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019