Hakim, Mohammad Omar (CPSO#: 66378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Robinhood court
North Bay ON  P1C 1L3
Phone: (705) 498-9314
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunderbay regional hospital centre
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Thunderbay regional hospital centre
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hakim ( CPSO# 66378 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
29 Robinhood Court
North Bay ON  P1C 1L3
Phone Number: (705) 498-9314

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
New Brunswick
USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 22, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 15, 2018, the North Bay Regional Health Centre (NBRHC) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospital Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that in September 2017, Dr. Mohammed Omar Hakim withdrew his application for reappointment and therefore allowed his privileges to lapse at NBRHC effective September 30, 2017.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAR HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: April 1, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

(1) 3 counts of assault at the City of North Bay at various times between January 1, 2013 and March 31, 2018 contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: April 1, 2018
Place of charges: North Bay, Ontario
North Bay Police Service


Source: Other
Active Date: April 1, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[April 1, 2018]
1.Notify the officer in charge, North Bay Police Service of his address within 48 hours of any change in his address.
2. Remain in the jurisdiction of the court, province of Ontario.
3. Deposit his passport with North Bay Police Service and not reapply for a passport or any other travel documents.
4. Not to contact or communicate either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with the specified persons except in the presence of or through legal counsel.
5. Not be within 100 metres of any place where he knows the specified persons live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows them to be except for required court appearances and to retrieve his belongings on one occasion supervised by a police officer.
6. Not to possess weapons.