Hakim, Mukhtar M M (CPSO#: 85800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: (905) 304-0052
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

202 - 710 Dorval Dr.
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: 9056070022
Fax: 9056070013
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3155 Harvester Road, Suite 207
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 631-2080
Fax: (905) 635-6215
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Suite 825
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-0997
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: 9058782383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

45 Hannover Dr.
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Canada
Phone: 9056849999
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.M. Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hakim ( CPSO# 85800 )

Business Address:
Ancaster Endoscopy
Suite 205
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 5A1
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKHTAR M M HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Dec 2006 to 26 Feb 2007
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 27 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2008 to 23 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2010 to 23 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2011 to 23 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2012 to 29 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012