Halankar, Jaydeep Arun (CPSO#: 85791)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mumbai, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 22 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016