Halbert, Cyril Franklyn (CPSO#: 92120)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Georgetown University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2013