Hall Barber, Karen Patricia (CPSO#: 72831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: Hall, Karen Patricia (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Queen's Family Health Team
Team 2 West A
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hall Barber ( CPSO# 72831 )
Dr. D. Barber ( CPSO# 86385 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Queen's Family Medicine Centre
319 - 220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN PATRICIA HALL BARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL BARBER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007