Hall, Gregory Allan (CPSO#: 85348)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 07 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007