Hall, Melanie Erin (CPSO#: 89129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone: (289) 323-0660
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hall ( CPSO# 89129 )

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
4-2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ERIN HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011