Hall, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 80875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Zone B 8th Floor Room B8-162
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76673
Fax: (519) 667-6514
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010