Hall, Ryan William (CPSO#: 93765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 969-0229
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 1B2
Canada
Phone: (613) 771-3400
Fax: (613) 771-1016
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hall ( CPSO# 93765 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN WILLIAM HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2013