Hall, Sarah Ayesha (CPSO#: 79467)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Shaikh, Sarah Ayesha (used until: 12 Sep 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2008