Halloran, Kieran Michael (CPSO#: 90467)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 2009 to 28 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013