Halpenny, John Stirling (CPSO#: 28255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
432 Canisteo Street
Hornell NY  14843
United States
Phone: (607) 324-8121
Fax: (607) 324-8124
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

191 North Main Street
Wellsville NY  14895
United States
Phone: (585) 596-2054
Fax: 5855960147
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN STIRLING HALPENNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPENNY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984