Halperin, Ilana Jaye (CPSO#: 86531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Room H121
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5
Phone: (416) 480-6056
Fax: (416) 480-5122
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ivers And Halperin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Halperin ( CPSO# 86531 )
Dr. N. Ivers ( CPSO# 86533 )

Business Address:
77 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room H121
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6056

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILANA JAYE HALPERIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALPERIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011