Halwani, Fawaz (CPSO#: 81984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Persian

Education:Shiraz University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Dept. Pathology Laboratory Medicine
501 Smyth Road
CCW-4106
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73133
Fax: (613) 739-6881
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Fawaz Halwani may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology
            only.