Hamadah, Sudqi M A S (CPSO#: 78566)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 23 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2007