Hamam, Al Walid (CPSO#: 94441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manitoba Clinic
101-790 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1M3
Phone: (204) 788-5758
Fax: (204) 789-9220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AL WALID HAMAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2010 to 16 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Oct 2010 to 05 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Nov 2010 to 15 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012