Hambly, Nathan Daniel Morley (CPSO#: 90964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Respirology
50 Charlton Avenue East, T2117
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36704
Fax: 905-521-6183
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathan Hambly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hambly ( CPSO# 90964 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Respirology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite T2117
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN DANIEL MORLEY HAMBLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMBLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013