Hamdy, Ahmed Alaa El-Din Ahmed Mahmoud (CPSO#: 82846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Anesthesia Department
30 Bond Street -6F-501 Donnelly Sou
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hamdy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hamdy ( CPSO# 82846 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Anesthesia Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED ALAA EL-DIN AHMED MAHMOUD HAMDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010