Hamdy, Cherine Charles Abmed (CPSO#: 57542)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010