Hamed Abdelazim, Hala Mohammed Fathi (CPSO#: 83318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 33375
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Ave, St Catharines
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
46 Portage Road Niagara Falls, ON
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Hamed Abdelazim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamed Abdelazim ( CPSO# 83318 )

Business Address:
NHS Welland Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALA MOHAMMED FATHI HAMED ABDELAZIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMED ABDELAZIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012