Hameed, Faiza (CPSO#: 91880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil, Urdu

Education:University of Madras, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough regional health center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3084
Fax: (705) 876-5012
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hameed ( CPSO# 91880 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Faiza  Hameed  may  practise  medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.