Hames, Heather Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road, Room E1-102
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Hames Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hames ( CPSO# 84430 )

Business Address:
LHSC
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road
Room E1-102
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH HAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011