Hamidi, Ahmad Ali (CPSO#: 94773)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Isfahan University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015