Hamilton, David Mark Patrick (CPSO#: 75509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 402
2039 Robertson road
Nepean ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 7965935
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hamilton ( CPSO# 75509 )

Business Address:
2039 Robertson Road
Suite 402
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 796-5935

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MARK PATRICK HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Jun 2000 to 14 Jul 2000
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2000 to 14 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 13 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 14 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 19 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003