Hamilton, James Joel Alexander (CPSO#: 88806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford County CHC
301 - 35 Metcalf Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Phone: (519) 539-1111
Fax: (519) 539-9111
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES JOEL ALEXANDER HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010